AL SB262 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 6:15 p.m. on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elder Abuse, Interagency Council for the Prevention of, established, members, duties, subject to Sunset Law, reports to Governor, and Legislature, Elder Abuse Prevention Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elder Abuse, Interagency Council for the Prevention of, established, members, duties, subject to Sunset Law, reports to Governor, and Legislature, Elder Abuse Prevention Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-19 - House - Black motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Irons motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Irons motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 6:15 p.m. on May 16, 2012
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-495.
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Black motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1543
2012-05-16 House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2012-05-10 Irons motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1385
2012-05-10 Executive Amendment Offered
2012-05-10 Forwarded to Governor
2012-05-03 Signature Requested
2012-05-03 Enrolled
2012-05-03 Irons motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 940
2012-05-03 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-03 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-02 Bridges intended to vote "Yea"
2012-05-02 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1179
2012-05-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1178
2012-05-02 Jones Amendment Offered
2012-05-02 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-23 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
2012-02-23 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 144
2012-02-23 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-09 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB262
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB262-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB262-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=427405&VOTE=144&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=443415&VOTE=1178&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=443416&VOTE=1179&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=443965&VOTE=940&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449158&VOTE=1385&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449825&VOTE=1543&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback