AL SB261 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Separation of powers, Article III and Amendment 582 of the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, combined into one section in modernized language but no substantive change, Article III and Amendment 582 repealed and Article III added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Separation of powers, Article III and Amendment 582 of the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, combined into one section in modernized language but no substantive change, Article III and Amendment 582 repealed and Article III added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Fielding motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HousePending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2014-04-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
2014-03-20SenateEngrossed
2014-03-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 991
2014-03-20SenateFielding motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 990
2014-03-20SenateConstitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered
2014-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-01-22SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback