AL SB261 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Weights and measures, registered service agent to conduct testing and inspection of devices, Agriculture and Industries Department to provide registration and regulation of agents, Board of Agriculture and Industries authorized to adopt a schedule of civil fines for violations, Secs. 8-16-1, 8-16-6, 8-16-7, 8-16-18 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weights and measures, registered service agent to conduct testing and inspection of devices, Agriculture and Industries Department to provide registration and regulation of agents, Board of Agriculture and Industries authorized to adopt a schedule of civil fines for violations, Secs. 8-16-1, 8-16-6, 8-16-7, 8-16-18 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2013-04-30SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-30SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2013-03-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-26SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback