AL SB261 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Pending third reading on day 10 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, motorcycles, Class M motorcycle license including restricted license to operate a motor-driven cycle, issuance by Public Safety Department, knowledge test required under certain conditions, Secs. 32-5A-240, 32-12-22 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, motorcycles, Class M motorcycle license including restricted license to operate a motor-driven cycle, issuance by Public Safety Department, knowledge test required under certain conditions, Secs. 32-5A-240, 32-12-22 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-01 Pending third reading on day 10 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security
2012-03-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-16 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2012-02-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 74
2012-02-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-09 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback