AL SB260 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, retail sale by state phased out, privilege granted to Class A and Class B licensees, inventory bailment system, tax, displaced employees benefits, leases, market zones established, Secs. 28-1-4, 28-2-22, 28-3-40, 28-3-43, 28-3-53.1, 28-3-53.2, 28-3-202, 28-3-205, 28-3-207, 28-3-241, 28-3A-11, 28-3A-12, 28-3A-19, 28-3A-21, 28-3A-22, 28-7-16 am'd.; Secs. 28-3-74, 28-3-280 to 28-3-286, inclusive, repealed on October 1, 2012
Title
Alcoholic beverages, retail sale by state phased out, privilege granted to Class A and Class B licensees, inventory bailment system, tax, displaced employees benefits, leases, market zones established, Secs. 28-1-4, 28-2-22, 28-3-40, 28-3-43, 28-3-53.1, 28-3-53.2, 28-3-202, 28-3-205, 28-3-207, 28-3-241, 28-3A-11, 28-3A-12, 28-3A-19, 28-3A-21, 28-3A-22, 28-7-16 am'd.; Secs. 28-3-74, 28-3-280 to 28-3-286, inclusive, repealed on October 1, 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |