AL SB260 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-240.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Grocery stores, program created to finance operation in low and moderate income areas, administered by ADECA, Healthy Food Financing Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grocery stores, program created to finance operation in low and moderate income areas, administered by ADECA, Healthy Food Financing Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Buskey motion to Table (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass pending Roll Call 900 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-21SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-240.
2015-05-21SenateEnrolled
2015-05-21HouseSignature Requested
2015-05-21HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-05-21SenateReed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1072
2015-05-21SenateConcurrence Requested
2015-05-19HouseMotion to again Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 904
2015-05-19HouseMotion to again adopt A&F amendment adopted Roll Call 903
2015-05-19HouseBuskey motion to Table A&F amenment adopted Roll Call 901
2015-05-19HouseBuskey motion to reconsider A&F amendment adopted Voice Vote
2015-05-19HouseBuskey motion to reconsider the bill adopted Voice Vote
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass pending Roll Call 900
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 899
2015-05-19HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
2015-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-31HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2015-03-31SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 216
2015-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB260
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB260-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB260-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=506919&VOTE=216&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519689&VOTE=899&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519692&VOTE=900&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519698&VOTE=901&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519716&VOTE=903&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519717&VOTE=904&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=520486&VOTE=1072&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback