AL SB26 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-528.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile sex offenders, notification provided to school of low-risk sex offender expanded to include local super of edu. and bd of edu., change in school required to be reported to local law enforcement by juvenile sex offender, state board of edu. required to develop and local boards to adopt, model policy for monitoring juvenile sex offenders in school, Secs. 15-20A-27, 15-20A-30 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile sex offenders, notification provided to school of low-risk sex offender expanded to include local super of edu. and bd of edu., change in school required to be reported to local law enforcement by juvenile sex offender, state board of edu. required to develop and local boards to adopt, model policy for monitoring juvenile sex offenders in school, Secs. 15-20A-27, 15-20A-30 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-528.
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1026
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1025
2018-03-27HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-22HouseWhorton (I) Amendment Offered
2018-03-27SenateEnrolled
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1024
2018-03-27HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-22HouseLovvorn Amendment Offered
2018-03-27SenateChambliss motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1163
2018-03-27SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1023
2018-03-22HouseEducation Policy first Substitute Offered
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-02-22HouseRereferred from PS&HS to EP
2018-02-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-02-15SenateEngrossed
2018-02-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 425
2018-02-15SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 424
2018-02-15SenateChambliss Amendment Offered
2018-02-15SenateChambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 423
2018-02-15SenateEducation and Youth Affairs Amendment Offered
2018-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB26&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB26-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB26-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB26-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189826-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191741-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192297-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192699-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/193853-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588488&VOTE=423&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588490&VOTE=424&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588491&VOTE=425&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600759&VOTE=1023&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600824&VOTE=1024&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600828&VOTE=1025&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600829&VOTE=1026&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601304&VOTE=1163&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback