AL SB259 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, brewpubs, annual barrel production limit that allows a beer manufacturer to have a financial interest in a brewpub, further provided, Sec. 28-4A-3 am'd.
Title
Alcoholic beverages, brewpubs, annual barrel production limit that allows a beer manufacturer to have a financial interest in a brewpub, further provided, Sec. 28-4A-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 695 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 694 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 693 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SBIR: Reed motion to Adopt Roll Call 586 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 694 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 693 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SBIR: Reed motion to Adopt Roll Call 586 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 695 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 694 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 693 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development zeroeth Substitute Offered |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reed motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
HB411 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism