AL SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Act No. 2019-206.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Act No. 2019-206.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fort Payne, city council, election of members further provided for, vacancies, Sec. 45-25A-40 am'd.
Title
Fort Payne, city council, election of members further provided for, vacancies, Sec. 45-25A-40 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-206. |
2019-05-14 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 634 |
2019-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 392 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |