AL SB259 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned Act No. 2016-152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, courts required to forward certain traffic offenses to Alabama Law Enforcement Agency, penalties for specified traffic offenses at railroad highway crossing grades revised, time frame for reporting nonresident commercial traffic violations, reduced, Secs. 32-5A-195, 32-5A-304, 32-6-49.11, 32-6-49.14 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, courts required to forward certain traffic offenses to Alabama Law Enforcement Agency, penalties for specified traffic offenses at railroad highway crossing grades revised, time frame for reporting nonresident commercial traffic violations, reduced, Secs. 32-5A-195, 32-5A-304, 32-6-49.11, 32-6-49.14 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-152. |
2016-04-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 587 |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 283 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |