AL SB259 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Assigned Act No. 2015-45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Assigned Act No. 2015-45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Clair Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, municipalities and co. commission (for unincorporated area of county) authorized to conduct referendums to approve, subject to further regulation by governing body
Title
St. Clair Co., alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, municipalities and co. commission (for unincorporated area of county) authorized to conduct referendums to approve, subject to further regulation by governing body
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-45. |
2015-04-14 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 339 |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 187 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |