AL SB257 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-352.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Irrigation projects, income tax credit, add'l credit authorized with cap, expiration, Sec. 40-18-342 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Irrigation projects, income tax credit, add'l credit authorized with cap, expiration, Sec. 40-18-342 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Lee motion to Table (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-352.
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateOrr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1287
2017-05-19SenateConcurrence Requested
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 988
2017-05-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 987
2017-05-18HouseLee Amendment Offered
2017-05-18HouseRECESS
2017-05-18HouseMooney intended to vote "Yea"
2017-05-18HouseLee motion to Table adopted Roll Call 986
2017-05-18HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2017-04-11SenateEngrossed
2017-04-06SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 495
2017-04-06SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 494
2017-04-06SenateAgriculture, Conservation, and Forestry first Substitute Offered
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2017-02-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB257&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB257-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB257-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB257-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183499-3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185452-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186618-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=567290&VOTE=494&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=567293&VOTE=495&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578549&VOTE=986&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578562&VOTE=987&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578563&VOTE=988&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578948&VOTE=1287&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback