AL SB256 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Education Policy second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health, St. Bd. of, immunization registry, reports re immunization vaccines, review by providers, Sec. 22-11B-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, St. Bd. of, immunization registry, reports re immunization vaccines, review by providers, Sec. 22-11B-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateEducation Policy second Amendment Offered
2019-05-15HousePending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Health
2019-05-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2019-05-07SenateEngrossed
2019-05-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 622
2019-05-07SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 621
2019-05-07SenateEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2019-05-07SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 620
2019-05-07SenateEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2019-05-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2019-04-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB256&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB256-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199304-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199190-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=616517&VOTE=620&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=616524&VOTE=621&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=616525&VOTE=622&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback