AL SB256 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Nondriver ID cards, parolees, Commissioner of Dept. of Corrections and Secretary of the ALEA, authority to establish program to issue nondriver ID to resident parolees upon release

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nondriver ID cards, parolees, Commissioner of Dept. of Corrections and Secretary of the ALEA, authority to establish program to issue nondriver ID to resident parolees upon release

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2016-03-15SenateEngrossed
2016-03-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 351
2016-03-10SenateFigures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 350
2016-03-10SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2016-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10SenateRoss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-03-10SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-02-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback