AL SB255 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Stadthagen intended to vote "Yea"
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State Health Officer, order issued in response to outbreak of a disease has full force of law if approved by Governor and filed with Secretary of State in state of emergency, Sec. 22-2-8 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health Officer, order issued in response to outbreak of a disease has full force of law if approved by Governor and filed with Secretary of State in state of emergency, Sec. 22-2-8 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 996 (Y: 40 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 995 (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - HBIR: Reynolds motion to Adopt Roll Call 930 (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 546 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 545 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 544 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-07HouseStadthagen intended to vote "Yea"
2022-04-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 996
2022-04-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 995
2022-04-07HouseReynolds Amendment Offered
2022-04-07HouseLost in second house
2022-03-30HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-03-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2022-03-10SenateEngrossed
2022-03-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 546
2022-03-10SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 545
2022-03-10SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2022-03-10SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2022-03-10SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2022-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2022-02-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2228Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB255&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB255-Int.pdf
Texthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/SB255-Eng.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/218311-2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/218572-2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/220033-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43934.htm
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44000.htm
Supplementhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/files/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44315.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=681844&VOTE=544&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB255&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=681848&VOTE=545&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=681849&VOTE=546&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=689748&VOTE=930&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20SB255&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=691118&VOTE=995&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=691150&VOTE=996&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback