AL SB255 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Madison Co., Twenty-third Judicial Circuit, additional circuit judge, compensation and benefits, election
Title
Madison Co., Twenty-third Judicial Circuit, additional circuit judge, compensation and benefits, election
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 530 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 529 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Smitherman first Substitute Offered |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Albritton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |