AL SB255 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Entertainment Industry Incentive Act of 2009, qualified production companies, tax rebates further provided for, tax exemptions limited to state portion of sales, use, and lodging tax, Secs. 41-7A-43, 41-7A-45 am'd.
Title
Entertainment Industry Incentive Act of 2009, qualified production companies, tax rebates further provided for, tax exemptions limited to state portion of sales, use, and lodging tax, Secs. 41-7A-43, 41-7A-45 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Slade Blackwell [R] | Sen. Gerald Dial [R] | Sen. Jimmy Holley [R] | Sen. George Keahey [D] |
Sen. Del Marsh [R] | Sen. Clay Scofield [R] | Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] | Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Sen. Thomas Whatley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Galliher motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Galliher motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Assigned Act No. 2011-695. | |
2011-06-09 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-09 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-09 | Treadaway intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1178 | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-09 | Galliher motion to Suspend Rules adopted Roll Call 1177 | |
2011-06-09 | Time Expired | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Open | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism. | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 566 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 565 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 564 | |
2011-05-05 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |