AL SB254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redevelopment Authorities, qualification for directors, Sec. 11-54A-7 am'd.
Title
Redevelopment Authorities, qualification for directors, Sec. 11-54A-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 514 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 513 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 513 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2021-03-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 514 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |