AL SB254 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hale Co., abolishing office of constable
Title
Hale Co., abolishing office of constable
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-319. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-05-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 818 |
2016-05-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 748 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |