AL SB254 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-313.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, allow owner of property, residential, and commercial, statewide to claim discount for structures retrofitted to resist storms, Secs. 27-31D-1, 27-31D-2, 27-31D-3 am'd.
Title
Insurance, allow owner of property, residential, and commercial, statewide to claim discount for structures retrofitted to resist storms, Secs. 27-31D-1, 27-31D-2, 27-31D-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-313. |
2015-05-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-26 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1225 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1081 |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1080 |
2015-05-26 | House | Insurance Amendment Offered |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 468 |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 467 |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Hightower first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Hightower motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |