AL SB253 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 8:06 p.m. May 7,2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 8:06 p.m. May 7,2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson Co., courts, additional court costs, proceeds to the Jackson County Judicial Employees Fund, to provide funding for employees, Act 2019-215, 2019 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Jackson Co., courts, additional court costs, proceeds to the Jackson County Judicial Employees Fund, to provide funding for employees, Act 2019-215, 2019 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 8:06 p.m. May 7,2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-119. |
2020-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 532 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 435 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |