AL SB252 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grove Hill, corp. limits alt.
Title
Grove Hill, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-267. |
2018-03-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 703 |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Albritton Amendment Offered |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |