AL SB251 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p.m. on May 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p.m. on May 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., planning and zoning districts, boards of adjustment, co. commission to appt. two bds., jurisdiction of each bd., alternate members, Sec. 45-2-216.10 am'd.
Title
Baldwin Co., planning and zoning districts, boards of adjustment, co. commission to appt. two bds., jurisdiction of each bd., alternate members, Sec. 45-2-216.10 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p.m. on May 8, 2020 |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-177. |
2020-05-08 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 564 |
2020-05-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |