AL SB251 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2016-72.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Autauga Co., sheriff, use of debit or credit card provided for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autauga Co., sheriff, use of debit or credit card provided for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 64 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-01SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-72.
2016-03-01SenateEnrolled
2016-03-01HouseSignature Requested
2016-03-01SenatePassed Second House
2016-03-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 153
2016-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-24HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2016-02-24SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 199
2016-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-02-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback