AL SB251 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Psychology, Board of Examiners in, qualifications and membership, inactive license fee, criminal history background checks, penalty for violations increased, obsolete language removed, Sec. 34-26-20 repealed; Secs. 34-26-21, 34-26-41, 34-26-43.1, 34-26-62, 34-26-65, 34-26-66 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychology, Board of Examiners in, qualifications and membership, inactive license fee, criminal history background checks, penalty for violations increased, obsolete language removed, Sec. 34-26-20 repealed; Secs. 34-26-21, 34-26-41, 34-26-43.1, 34-26-62, 34-26-65, 34-26-66 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-05HousePending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions with 1 amendment
2015-05-05HouseBoards, Agencies and Commissions first Amendment Offered
2015-05-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 751
2015-05-05SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 750
2015-05-05SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2015-05-05SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 749
2015-05-14HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-05-05SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2015-05-05SenateEngrossed
2015-05-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2015-04-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback