AL SB251 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Garrett Coliseum, appropriation to Agricultural Center Board for renovation, beginning fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, changed to year 2013, Sec. 2-6-12 am'd. (2011-20949)
Title
Garrett Coliseum, appropriation to Agricultural Center Board for renovation, beginning fiscal year ending September 30, 2012, changed to year 2013, Sec. 2-6-12 am'd. (2011-20949)
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Assigned Act No. 2011-694. | |
2011-06-09 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-09 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1187 | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund | |
2011-05-25 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 717 | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 716 | |
2011-05-25 | Orr first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |