AL SB25 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Nursing, authorized by rule to clarify scope of practice of certified nursing support technicians, disciplinary actions clarified
Title
Board of Nursing, authorized by rule to clarify scope of practice of certified nursing support technicians, disciplinary actions clarified
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 82 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Healthcare |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Prefiled |