AL SB25 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-200.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Assigned Act No. 2015-200.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Separation of powers of executive, legislative, and judicial branches, Article III and Amendment 582 of the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, combined into one section, Article III and Amendment 582 repealed and Article III added
Title
Separation of powers of executive, legislative, and judicial branches, Article III and Amendment 582 of the Constitution of Alabama of 1901, combined into one section, Article III and Amendment 582 repealed and Article III added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-200. |
2015-05-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-19 | House | Sessions intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 907 |
2015-05-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 358 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |