AL SB249 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Act No. 2021-276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Call centers, certain terms further defined, to require employers relocating call centers to notify Secretary of Commerce Dept. rather than the Dept. of Economic and Community Affairs director, Act 2019-374, 2019 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 41-23-230, 41-23-231, 41-23-235 am'd.
Title
Call centers, certain terms further defined, to require employers relocating call centers to notify Secretary of Commerce Dept. rather than the Dept. of Economic and Community Affairs director, Act 2019-374, 2019 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 41-23-230, 41-23-231, 41-23-235 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 820 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 819 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 270 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 269 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 819 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 270 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - SBIR: Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 269 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-276. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-15 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 820 |
2021-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 270 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 23 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 23 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |