AL SB247 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Farmers' Market Authority, transfer to Agriculture and Industries Department, approval of Commissioner and Board of Agriculture and Industries for certain actions by authority, duties, bonding authority, Secs. 2-5-1 to 2-5-17, incl., 2-5-30 to 2-5-39, incl., repealed; Secs. 2-5A-1 to 2-5A-15, incl., 2-5A-30 to 2-5A-39, incl., added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farmers' Market Authority, transfer to Agriculture and Industries Department, approval of Commissioner and Board of Agriculture and Industries for certain actions by authority, duties, bonding authority, Secs. 2-5-1 to 2-5-17, incl., 2-5-30 to 2-5-39, incl., repealed; Secs. 2-5A-1 to 2-5A-15, incl., 2-5A-30 to 2-5A-39, incl., added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-286.
2013-05-20HouseSignature Requested
2013-05-20SenateEnrolled
2013-05-20HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1041
2013-05-20SenateConcurrence Requested
2013-05-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1126
2013-05-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1125
2013-05-07HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
2013-05-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2013-04-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 392
2013-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-26SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB247
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB247-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB247-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=464867&VOTE=392&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=473591&VOTE=1125&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=473593&VOTE=1126&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475723&VOTE=1041&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback