AL SB243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-458.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-458.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, ad valorem tax, tax collector, revenue commissioner, or other tax collecting official, final settlement required by Nov. 1 of each year with State Comptroller's office, civil penalties, Sec. 40-5-44 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, ad valorem tax, tax collector, revenue commissioner, or other tax collecting official, final settlement required by Nov. 1 of each year with State Comptroller's office, civil penalties, Sec. 40-5-44 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-458. |
2019-05-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-05-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1211 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 673 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |