AL SB242 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Innovation Districts; establishment of by counties and municipalities as public corporation authorized; provide for the powers of innovation districts
Title
Innovation Districts; establishment of by counties and municipalities as public corporation authorized; provide for the powers of innovation districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Carried Over |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute Offered MFPRW1W-1 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development 1st Substitute MFPRW1W-1 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |