AL SB242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2011, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council
Title
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2011, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] | Sen. Rusty Glover [R] | Sen. Shadrack McGill [R] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Sen. Clay Scofield [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Scofield motion to Table Ross Amendment (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Bedford Amendment (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Scofield motion to Table Ross Amendment (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Bedford Amendment (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 20111 | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-634. | |
2011-06-01 | Beech intended to vote "Yea" | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 937 | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1043 | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1042 | |
2011-06-01 | Clouse Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund | |
2011-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 367 | |
2011-04-26 | Scofield motion to Table Ross Amendment adopted Roll Call 366. | |
2011-04-26 | Ross Amendment Offered. | |
2011-04-26 | Bedford Amendment adopted Roll Call 365. | |
2011-04-26 | Bedford Amendment Offered | |
2011-04-26 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment adopted Roll Call 364. | |
2011-04-26 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered. | |
2011-04-26 | Third Reading Open | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |