AL SB241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Court costs, attorney compensation in commitment proceeding further provided for, Sec. 22-52-14 am'd.
Title
Court costs, attorney compensation in commitment proceeding further provided for, Sec. 22-52-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 743 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 742 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 742 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 743 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |