AL SB241 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Act No. 2017-283.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned Act No. 2017-283.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Industrial Access Fund, roads, expanded to include use for access to military property and for non-industrial sites, Sec. 23-6-1 am'd.
Title
Industrial Access Fund, roads, expanded to include use for access to military property and for non-industrial sites, Sec. 23-6-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-283. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-05-09 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 937 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2017-05-04 | House | Polizos and Wilcox intended to vote "Yea" |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 791 |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 790 |
2017-05-04 | House | Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 400 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 399 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |