AL SB241 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-495.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Campaign Practices Act, revised, State Campaign Finance Commission, created, Secs. 17-5-7.2, 17-5-19.1, 17-5-19.2, 17-5-21, 36-14-18 added; Secs.17-5-2, 17-5-4 to 17-5-10, inclusive, 17-5-19, 36-25-3, 36-25-4, 36-25-14, 36-25-15 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Campaign Practices Act, revised, State Campaign Finance Commission, created, Secs. 17-5-7.2, 17-5-19.1, 17-5-19.2, 17-5-21, 36-14-18 added; Secs.17-5-2, 17-5-4 to 17-5-10, inclusive, 17-5-19, 36-25-3, 36-25-4, 36-25-14, 36-25-15 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-495.
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04SenatePassed Second House
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1356
2015-06-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-06-04HouseHammon motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-06-04HouseThird Reading Open
2015-05-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-19SenateEngrossed
2015-05-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance
2015-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1018
2015-05-19SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1017
2015-05-19SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-19SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-05-07SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-05-07SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 894
2015-05-07SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2015-05-07SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-05-05SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-05-05SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 781
2015-05-05SenateConstitution, Ethics and Elections first Substitute Offered
2015-05-05SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-04-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-03-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB241
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB241-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB241-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB241-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=515191&VOTE=781&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=516648&VOTE=894&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519143&VOTE=1017&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519145&VOTE=1018&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=527021&VOTE=1356&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback