AL SB240 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
911 telephone calls, procedure for release of records, transcripts, further provided, Sec. 11-98-12 am'd.
Title
911 telephone calls, procedure for release of records, transcripts, further provided, Sec. 11-98-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 509 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 508 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 507 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 506 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 508 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 507 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 506 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 509 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 508 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 507 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |