AL SB240 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use tax, durable medical equipment, prosthetics and orthotics, and certain medical supplies, exempt when covered and paid by third party
Title
Sales and use tax, durable medical equipment, prosthetics and orthotics, and certain medical supplies, exempt when covered and paid by third party
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Beasley motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 10:46 a.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-443. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1215 |
2013-05-09 | House | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1214 |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 622 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Beasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 621 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Beasley Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 620 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |