AL SB24 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Pending third reading on day 8 Favorable from Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Pending third reading on day 8 Favorable from Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, reinsurance, regulation and credit against reserves, adoption of similar act to Credit for Reinsurance Model Law by Nat. Assoc. of Insurance Commissioners, Secs. 27-5B-8.1, 27-5B-20 added; Secs. 27-5B-3, 27-5B-9, 27-5B-11, 27-5B-14, 27-5B-19 am'd.
Title
Insurance, reinsurance, regulation and credit against reserves, adoption of similar act to Credit for Reinsurance Model Law by Nat. Assoc. of Insurance Commissioners, Secs. 27-5B-8.1, 27-5B-20 added; Secs. 27-5B-3, 27-5B-9, 27-5B-11, 27-5B-14, 27-5B-19 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 178 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 177 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 176 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 177 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Roberts motion to Adopt Roll Call 176 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Pending third reading on day 8 Favorable from Insurance |
2021-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 178 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 177 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
HB32 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:43 p.m. on April 13, 2021.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 5B | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5B | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5B | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5B | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5B | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5B | 8.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5B | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |