AL SB24 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms, possession and carrying of, certain requirements for, repealed or deleted, Secs. 9-11-304, 13A-11-50, 13A-11-51, 13A-11-52, 13A-11-59, 13A-11-71, 13A-11-73, 13A-11-74, repealed; Sec. 13A-11-61.2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, possession and carrying of, certain requirements for, repealed or deleted, Secs. 9-11-304, 13A-11-50, 13A-11-51, 13A-11-52, 13A-11-59, 13A-11-71, 13A-11-73, 13A-11-74, repealed; Sec. 13A-11-61.2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2017-04-18SenateEngrossed
2017-04-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 630
2017-04-18SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 629
2017-04-18SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 628
2017-04-18SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateAllen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 627
2017-04-18SenateAllen motion to Table lost Voice Vote
2017-04-18SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateAllen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 626
2017-04-18SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateAllen motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-03-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB24&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB24-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/183264-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569481&VOTE=626&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569497&VOTE=627&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569499&VOTE=628&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569500&VOTE=629&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569501&VOTE=630&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback