AL SB24 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-307.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Assigned Act No. 2015-307.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bishop State Community College, Southern Union State Community College, Bevill State Community College, and the Alabama Department of Postsecondary Education, who are part of the Alabama Career Center System to Department of Labor
Title
Bishop State Community College, Southern Union State Community College, Bevill State Community College, and the Alabama Department of Postsecondary Education, who are part of the Alabama Career Center System to Department of Labor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-307. |
2015-05-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078 |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 432 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scofield first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 129 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scofield Amendment Offered |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |