AL SB24 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Government Operations with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Government Operations with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Private Investigation Board, established, members, terms, powers, vacancies, private investigators, licensure and regulation, subject to Administrative Procedure Act, civil and criminal penalties, Private Investigators Licensing and Regulatory Act
Title
Private Investigation Board, established, members, terms, powers, vacancies, private investigators, licensure and regulation, subject to Administrative Procedure Act, civil and criminal penalties, Private Investigators Licensing and Regulatory Act
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Government Operations with 1 substitute | |
2010-03-03 | Government Operations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Operations | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 165 | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 164 | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 163 | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 162 | |
2010-02-11 | Governmental Affairs Amendment No. 3 Offered. | |
2010-02-11 | Governmental Affairs Amendment No. 2 Offered. | |
2010-02-11 | Governmental Affairs Amendment No. 1 Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |