AL SB239 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2017-142.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2017-142.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hale Co., probate office, add'l transaction fees, co. commission authorized to establish, distrib.
Title
Hale Co., probate office, add'l transaction fees, co. commission authorized to establish, distrib.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2017-142. |
2017-04-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 410 |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 318 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |