AL SB237 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Contracts, payment of state contractors, state may not increase time for payment beyond 30 days, time frame to hold pre-bid meetings specified, review of invoices in specified time frame required, alteration of contract allowed under certain circumstances, Sec. 39-2-2, 39-2-12 am'd.
Title
Contracts, payment of state contractors, state may not increase time for payment beyond 30 days, time frame to hold pre-bid meetings specified, review of invoices in specified time frame required, alteration of contract allowed under certain circumstances, Sec. 39-2-2, 39-2-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Pending third reading on day 29 from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Rereferred from State Government to Transportation, Utilities & Infrastructure |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 657 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 656 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 655 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Marsh first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability |