AL SB237 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, wine, bottle opened on premises of licensee, recorking or resealing, patron may transport in vehicle, not considered an open container, Sec. 28-3A-20.1 added
Title
Alcoholic beverages, wine, bottle opened on premises of licensee, recorking or resealing, patron may transport in vehicle, not considered an open container, Sec. 28-3A-20.1 added
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-05-02 | Sanford motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-04-19 | Sanford to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-04-19 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |