AL SB236 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Assigned Act No. 2019-511.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical Marijuana, Medical Cannabis Study Commission, established, membership and duties provided, defense against prosecution for marijuana possession established, Secs. 13A-12-214.2, 13A-12-214.3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana, Medical Cannabis Study Commission, established, membership and duties provided, defense against prosecution for marijuana possession established, Secs. 13A-12-214.2, 13A-12-214.3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Melson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateAssigned Act No. 2019-511.
2019-05-31HouseSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled
2019-05-31SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2019-05-31SenateMelson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1480
2019-05-31SenateConcurrence Requested
2019-05-31HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-31HouseGarrett intended to vote "Yea"
2019-05-31HouseGarrett intended to vote "Yea"
2019-05-31HouseGarrett intended to vote "Yea"
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1275
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1274
2019-05-31HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1273
2019-05-31HouseHealth Amendment Offered
2019-05-31HouseHealth first Substitute Offered
2019-05-31HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-29HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2019-05-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
2019-05-09SenateEngrossed
2019-05-09SenateMelson motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683
2019-05-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-08SenateMelson motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-08SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 680
2019-05-08SenateMelson first Substitute Offered
2019-05-08SenateMelson motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-08SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-04-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB236&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB236-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB236-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB236-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199712-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200482-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202230-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202163-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=617339&VOTE=680&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=617719&VOTE=683&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627731&VOTE=1273&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627732&VOTE=1274&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627733&VOTE=1275&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627945&VOTE=1480&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback