AL SB236 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned Act No. 2018-495.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama State University, authority and responsibilities of the board of trustees and president of university, further provided for, Secs. 16-50-20, 16-50-23, 16-50-27 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama State University, authority and responsibilities of the board of trustees and president of university, further provided for, Secs. 16-50-20, 16-50-23, 16-50-27 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-495.
2018-03-28HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-28SenateEnrolled
2018-03-28SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-28HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1096
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-22HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
2018-03-22SenateEngrossed
2018-03-21SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 971
2018-03-21SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 970
2018-03-21SenateEducation and Youth Affairs first Substitute Offered
2018-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback