AL SB236 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Delivered to Governor at 6:20 p.m. on May 1, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Counties, planning commissions, subdivisions in extraterritorial jurisdiction of municipal planning commission, regulated under certain conditions, agreements with municipalities authorized, plats, approval by county engineer further provided for, Secs. 11-52-1, 11-52-30, 11-52-31, 11-52-32, 11-52-33 am'd.; Secs. 11-24-5, 11-52-36 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties, planning commissions, subdivisions in extraterritorial jurisdiction of municipal planning commission, regulated under certain conditions, agreements with municipalities authorized, plats, approval by county engineer further provided for, Secs. 11-52-1, 11-52-30, 11-52-31, 11-52-32, 11-52-33 am'd.; Secs. 11-24-5, 11-52-36 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-01 Delivered to Governor at 6:20 p.m. on May 1, 2012
2012-05-01 Assigned Act No. 2012-297.
2012-05-01 Enrolled
2012-05-01 Signature Requested
2012-05-01 Passed Second House
2012-05-01 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1120
2012-05-01 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-12 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-04-03 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2012-04-03 Engrossed
2012-03-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 418
2012-03-22 Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 417
2012-03-22 Sanford Amendment Offered
2012-03-22 Sanford motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2012-03-22 Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 416
2012-03-22 Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2012-03-22 Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2012-03-22 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2012-02-08 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB236
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB236-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB236-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB236-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=434287&VOTE=416&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=434290&VOTE=417&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=434291&VOTE=418&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=442519&VOTE=1120&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback