AL SB235 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and offenses, juveniles, prohibit release confidential information
Title
Crimes and offenses, juveniles, prohibit release confidential information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 549 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-18 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 549 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB320 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar