AL SB233 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Ways and Means Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax, filing requirement threshold to be sum of standard deduction and personal exemptions, Sec. 40-18-27 am'd.
Title
Income tax, filing requirement threshold to be sum of standard deduction and personal exemptions, Sec. 40-18-27 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Ways and Means Education |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 783 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |